EP0831469 - Hologram optical pick-up using two laser sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jin-hwan 1-1202, Samsung 1st Apt., Maetan-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon, Kyonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Shin, Hun-kuk 101-1003 Samsung APT., Wooman-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon, Kyonggi-do / KR | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307388.5 | 22.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | KR19960042120 | 24.09.1996 Original published format: KR 9642120 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0831469 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0831469 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831469 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B7/135 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/08 (KR);
G11B7/127 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/16] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Holographischer Abtastkopf mit zwei Laserquellen | [1998/13] | English: | Hologram optical pick-up using two laser sources | [1998/13] | French: | Tête optique holographique à deux sources laser | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0254434 ; | [A]JPS61260434 ; | [A]JPH04157635 ; | [A]EP0581597 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH04219658 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900516), vol. 014, no. 230, Database accession no. (P - 1048), & JP02054434 A 19900223 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870409), vol. 011, no. 112, Database accession no. (P - 565), & JP61260434 A 19861118 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920918), vol. 016, no. 451, Database accession no. (P - 1424), & JP04157635 A 19920529 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921209), vol. 016, no. 568, Database accession no. (P - 1458), & JP04219658 A 19920810 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0747893 |