EP0834862 - Method of key-phrase detection and verification for flexible speech understanding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juang, Biing-Hwang 8 South Lane Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 02 /
Lee, Chin-Hui 118 Runnymede Parkway New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 03 /
Kawahara, Tatsuya Fushimi-Godo, 122, Higashi-bugyo Fushimi-ku, Kyoto, 61200 / JP | 04 /
Chou, Wu 22 Greenbriar Drive Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | [1999/02] |
Former [1998/15] | 01 /
Juang, Biing-Hwang 8 South Lane Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | ||
02 /
Lee, Chin-Hui 118 Runnymede Parkway New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | |||
03 /
Kawahara, Tatsuya Fushimi-Godo, 122, Higashi-bugyo Fushimi-ku, Kyoto, 61200 / JP | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307401.6 | 23.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | US19960724413 | 01.10.1996 Original published format: US 724413 | US19960771732 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: US 771732 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0834862 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0834862 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
G10L15/18 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (EP,US);
G10L2015/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/33] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erkennung und Verifikation von Schlüsselsätzen für flexibles Sprachverständnis | [1998/15] | English: | Method of key-phrase detection and verification for flexible speech understanding | [1998/15] | French: | Procédé de détection et vérification de phrases-clefs pour la compréhension flexible de la parole | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/23] | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD] - KAWAHARA T ET AL, "Concept-based phrase spotting approach for spontaneous speech understanding", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.96CH35903), 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, ATLANTA, GA, USA, 7-10 M, ISBN 0-7803-3192-3, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 291 - 298 vol. 1, XP002080837 [YD] 1-4,9,13-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1996.540415 | [Y] - JEANRENAUD P ET AL, "Spotting events in continuous speech", ICASSP-94. 1994 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.94CH3387-8), PROCEEDINGS OF ICASSP '94. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ADELAIDE, SA, AUSTRALIA, 19-22 APRIL 1, ISBN 0-7803-1775-0, 1994, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages I/381 - 4 vol.1, XP002080838 [Y] 1-4,9,13-17 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [03.1] * * page 383, column R, line 1 - line 28; figure 3 * | [XP] - KAWAHARA T ET AL, "Key-phrase detection and verification for flexible speech understanding", PROCEEDINGS ICSLP 96. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (CAT. NO.96TH8206), PROCEEDING OF FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING. ICSLP '96, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, 3-6 OCT. 1996, ISBN 0-7803-3555-4, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 861 - 864 vol.2, XP002080839 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSLP.1996.607737 | [XP] - KAWAHARA T ET AL, "Combining key-phrase detection and subword-based verification for flexible speech understanding", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.97CB36052), 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, MUNICH, GERMANY, 21-24 APRIL 1997, ISBN 0-8186-7919-0, 1997, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 1159 - 1162 vol.2, XP002080840 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * |