EP0858113 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Shunsuke, c/o Oki Electric Industry Co. Ltd. 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307411.5 | 23.09.1997 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | JP19970033074 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: JP 3307497 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858113 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/10, H01L29/08, H01L27/092 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H01L29/41766 (EP,US);
H01L21/28 (KR);
H01L27/0928 (EP,US);
H01L29/1087 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement | [1998/33] | English: | Semiconductor device | [1998/33] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/48] | 11.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPS63252464 ; | [XY]JPS55162270 ; | [X]GB2049273 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [X] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 47; figure 9 *; | [Y]US5355006 (IGUCHI KATSUJI [JP]) [Y] 4 * figures 2,4 *; | [XA]EP0305975 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figures 4B,5I; claim 7 * [A] 2,7,10; | [X]GB2285884 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [X] 1 * figure 3C *; | [A]EP0055411 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 4 * figure 5 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890216), vol. 013, no. 068, Database accession no. (E - 716), & JP63252464 A 19881019 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3,5,8 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,10 [Y] 4,9 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810304), vol. 005, no. 034, Database accession no. (E - 048), & JP55162270 A 19801217 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 9 |