EP0833240 - Loop control detection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maggio, Kenneth J. 8616 Beauregard, Apt. D Dallas, Texas 75225 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307584.9 | 26.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | US19960027385P | 27.09.1996 Original published format: US 27385 P | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0833240 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0833240 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46, H02P7/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
G05F1/46 (EP,US);
G05F1/10 (KR);
H02P6/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | G05F1/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/19] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Regelschleifendetektionsschaltung | [1998/14] | English: | Loop control detection circuit | [1998/14] | French: | Circuit de détection de boucle de commande | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3724433 (VOSS J, et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US3955130 (GRAF CARLTON E) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5021937 (COHEN ITZCHAK [US]) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [A]US5210527 (SMITH DEWEY W [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5493189 (LING KUOK Y [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |