EP0832962 - Thermal apparatus and process for removing contaminants from oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBERTA OIL SANDS TECHNOLOGY AND RESEARCH AUTHORITY C/o Alberta Energy Research And External Relations 5th Floor, Monenco Place, 801 6 Avenue S.W. Calgary, Alberta T2P 3W2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states ALBERTA OIL SANDS TECHNOLOGY AND RESEARCH AUTHORITY c/o Alberta Energy Research and External Relations, 5th Floor, Monenco Place, 801, 6 Avenue S.W. Calgary, Alberta T2P 3W2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taciuk, William 35 Suncastle Bay S.E. Calgary, Alberta / CA | 02 /
Odut, Steve 208 Edelweiss Drive N.W. Calgary, Alberta / CA | 03 /
Taciuk, Gordon 3 Woodmount Drive S.E. Calgary, Alberta / CA | 04 /
Wheeler, Charlie 135 Silvercrest Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta / CA | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [1998/14] | Pidgeon, Robert John Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307661.5 | 29.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | CA19962186658 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: CA 2186658 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832962 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832962 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832962 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10M175/00, C10B55/04, C10G9/28, A62D3/00, C10B1/10, C10B47/30, B01J19/28 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
B01J19/28 (EP);
C10B1/10 (EP);
C10B47/30 (EP);
C10B55/02 (EP);
C10G9/28 (EP);
C10M175/0025 (EP);
B01J2208/00212 (EP);
B01J2208/00247 (EP);
B01J2208/00504 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | C10M175/00, C10B55/04, C10G9/28, A62D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/07] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermisches Gerät und Verfahren zum Entfernen von Verunreinigungen aus Öl | [1998/14] | English: | Thermal apparatus and process for removing contaminants from oil | [1998/14] | French: | Appareil thermique et procédé pour éliminer des matières polluantes de l'huile | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | New documents discovered [1999/42] | 01.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 26.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00203474.2 / EP1067171 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE699707 (I.G. FARBENINDUSTRIE AKT. GES.) [X] 1,8,10,11,16 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,7,12; | [XA]DE3741623 (SALZGITTER) [X] 1,8,10,16 * claims 1,2 * [A] 3-5,7,12; | [A]EP0028666 (ALBERTA OIL SANDS TECHNLOGY AND RESEARCH AUTHORITY) [A] 1,6,8-10,12,13 * page 1, line 6 - line 10; figure 1 * * page 19, line 10 - line 23 * * page 21, line 1 - line 8 *; | [A]JPH02194097 ; | [DA]US5271808 (EC. SHURTLEFF); | [DA]US4473464 (L.D. BOYER) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901015), vol. 014, no. 470, Database accession no. (C - 0769), & JP02194097 A 19900731 (MASANORI IWASE) [A] 1 * abstract * |