EP0837365 - Membrane mask structure, fabrication and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Acosta, Raul Edmundo 115 Ogdon Avenue White Plains, New York 10605 / US | 02 /
Viswanathan, Raman Gobichettipalayam 25 Crest Drive Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510 / US | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited, intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307889.2 | 07.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | US19960731536 | 16.10.1996 Original published format: US 731536 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837365 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
G03F1/22 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
G03F1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Struktur, Herstellung und Verwendung einer Membranmaske | [1998/17] | English: | Membrane mask structure, fabrication and use | [1998/17] | French: | Structure, fabrication et utilisation d'une masque à membrane | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/19] | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS592323 ; | [A]GB2089524 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0374701 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * examples 1-4 *; | [XA]EP0538940 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,11 * the whole document * [A] 3-10; | [A]US5227268 (KOGA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 67; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840413), vol. 8, no. 81, Database accession no. (E - 238), & JP59002323 A 00000000 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |