EP0836121 - Toner for developing electrostatic image, and image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Aliment Industry Co., Ltd. 7764, Nanbu-cho Nanbu, Minami Komagun Yamanashi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsunaga, Satoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ohno, Manabu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Doujo, Tadashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307954.4 | 08.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | JP19960268299 | 09.10.1996 Original published format: JP 26829996 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836121 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0836121 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836121 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/087, C08F257/02 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
C08F257/00 (EP,US);
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
G03G9/081 (EP,US);
G03G9/08711 (EP,US);
G03G9/08782 (EP,US);
G03G9/08788 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Toner für die Entwicklung electrostatischer Bilder, und Bildherstellungsverfahren | [1998/16] | English: | Toner for developing electrostatic image, and image forming method | [1998/16] | French: | Révélateur pour le développement d'images électrostatiques, et procédé de formation d'image | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0718703 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,18-37 * page 6, line 8 - line 39; figure 1; claims 1-48 *; | [X]GB2232160 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 38,39 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 1; example 4; claims 1-5 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP0354466 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 14 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5066727 (AIZAWA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [A] 14,38 * claims 1-3,9,11 *; | [A]EP0516153 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-4 * |