EP0838842 - Plasma reactor with heated source of a polymer-hardening precursor material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collins, Kenneth 165 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | 02 /
Rice, Michael 675 Claret Court Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | 03 /
Groechel, David 801 Mulberry Lane Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 04 /
Yin, Gerald Zheyao 10132 Bilich Place Cupertino, California 95015 / US | 05 /
Mohn, Jon 13179 Paseo Presada Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 06 /
Roderick, Craig 776 Pineview Drive San Jose, California 95117 / US | 07 /
Buchberger, Douglas 421 Czerny Street Tracy, California 95376 / US | 08 /
Yang, Chan-Lon 16569 Camellia Terrace Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | 09 /
Wong, Jerry 44994 Cougar Circle Fremont, California 94539 / US | 10 /
Marks, Jeffrey 4730 Cielo Vista Way San Jose, California 95129 / US | 11 /
Keswick, Peter 4850 Katheryne Court Fremont, CA 94536 / US | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/18] | 01 /
Collins, Kenneth 165 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | ||
02 /
Rice, Michael 675 Claret Court Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | |||
03 /
Groechel, David 801 Mulberry Lane Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | |||
04 /
Yin, Gerald Zheyao 10132 Bilich Place Cupertino, California 95015 / US | |||
05 /
Mohn, Jon 13179 Paseo Presada Saratoga, California 95070 / US | |||
06 /
Roderick, Craig 776 Pineview Drive San Jose, California 95117 / US | |||
07 /
Buchberger, Douglas 421 Czerny Street Tracy, California 95376 / US | |||
08 /
Yang, Chan-Lon 16569 Camellia Terrace Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | |||
09 /
Wong, Jerry 44994 Cougar Circle Fremont, California 94539 / US | |||
10 /
Marks, Jeffrey 4730 Cielo Vista Way San Jose, California 95129 / US | |||
11 /
Keswick, Peter 6371-A Joaquin Murieta Avenue Newark, California 94560 / US | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308401.5 | 22.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | US19960734797 | 23.10.1996 Original published format: US 734797 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838842 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838842 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H05H1/46, C23C16/50, C23C16/40, H01L21/311 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01J37/32082 (EP,US);
H01J37/32146 (EP,US);
H01J37/32165 (EP,US);
H01J37/32458 (EP,US);
H01J37/32467 (EP,US);
H01J37/32522 (EP,US);
H01J37/32688 (EP,US);
H01J37/32706 (EP,US);
H01J37/32871 (EP,US);
H01L21/31116 (EP,US);
H01F2029/143 (EP,US);
H01J2237/3343 (EP,US);
H01J2237/3345 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/18] | H01J37/32, H05H1/46, C23C16/50 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/38] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plasmareaktor mit einer geheizten Polymerhärter-Vorläufermaterialquelle | [1998/18] | English: | Plasma reactor with heated source of a polymer-hardening precursor material | [1998/18] | French: | Réacteur à plasma comportant une source chauffée de matériau précurseur durcisseur de polymère | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/17] | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0552491 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0552490 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-59* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0596551 (NOVELLUS SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0601468 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0651434 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0807952 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [E] 1-59 * the whole document * |