EP0838466 - Producing process of (fluoroaryl) borane compound and producing process of tetrakis (fluoroaryl) borate derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsui, Hitoshi 4-6 Kanmaki, Kanmaki-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 639-02 / JP | 02 /
Katsumi, Ikuyo 6-13 1-chome Ebie Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Naoko 3-28 1-chome Kamioichi Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663 / JP | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Ablewhite, Alan James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Ablewhite, Alan James MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308447.8 | 23.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | JP19960284170 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: JP 28417096 | JP19960284173 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: JP 28417396 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838466 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838466 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
C07F5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/33] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI | ||
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von (Fluoraryl)boranverbindungen und Tetrakis(fluoraryl)boratderivate | [1998/18] | English: | Producing process of (fluoroaryl) borane compound and producing process of tetrakis (fluoroaryl) borate derivative | [1998/18] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de (fluoroaryl)boranes et pour la préparation de dérivés de tétrakis(fluoroaryl)borate | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 24.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/51] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE4337083 (TOYO STAUFFER CHEM CO [JP]) [XD] 6-10 * column 5, line 15 - line 41 * * column 7, lines 1-24 *; | [XA]EP0604963 (TOYO STAUFFER CHEM CO [JP]) [X] 6-10 * examples 6,9 * * page 4, column 6, line 35 - page 5, column 7, line 18; example 1 * [A] 15-23; | [XY]EP0604961 (TOYO STAUFFER CHEM CO [JP]) [X] 11-14 * example 7; claim 2 * * examples 1-6,8,9 * * example 7; claim 2 * [Y] 29-33,24-28; | [YDA]EP0604959 (TOYO STAUFFER CHEM CO [JP]) [YD] 24-33 * claim 1; table 1 * * examples 1,2 * * examples 1,2 * [Y] 29-33,24-28 [A] 15-23; | [X]EP0728761 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, column 3, line 3 - page 3, column 4, line 10; claim 10 * * examples 1,2 *; | [A]EP0728760 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US]) [A] 11-14 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 7; examples 2,3; claims 6-9 *; | [E]EP0825195 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [E] 15-33* examples 1-11; claims 1-36 *; | [E]WO9822470 (BOULDER SCIENT CO [US], et al) [E] 6-10 * example 2 *; | [E]WO9822475 (BOULDER SCIENT CO [US], et al) [E] 6-10 * claims 3-7 *; | [XD] - POHLMANN J L ET AL, "PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF GROUP IIIA DERIVIRATES", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFORSCHUNG, TEIL B: ANORGANISCHE CHEMIE, ORGANISCHE CHEMIE, (19650101), vol. 20B, pages 5 - 11, XP000612719 [XD] 6-10 * See on page 9 under: a) General Procedure * | [AD] - ROBERT J. HARPER, "REACTIONS OF ORGANOMETALLICS WITH FLUOROAROMATIC COMPOUNDS", J. ORG. CHEM., (1964), vol. 29, pages 2385 - 2389, XP002114021 [AD] 15-33 * page 2388, column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 50 * |