EP0844377 - Control system for a ducted fan gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | ||
For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | |||
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | ||
For all designated states BMW ROLLS-ROYCE GmbH Hohemarkstrasse 60-70 61440 Oberursel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowe, Arthur Laurence 11 South Avenue Littleover, Derby DE23 6BA / GB | 02 /
Kurz, Nikolaus Eisenacher Strasse 71 10823 Berlin / DE | [1998/27] |
Former [1998/22] | 01 /
Rowe, Arthur Laurence 11 South Avenue Littleover, Derby DE23 6BA / GB | ||
02 /
Kurz, Nikolaus Hubertusstrasse 11 12163 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 97308461.9 | 23.10.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | GB19960024070 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9624070 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844377 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844377 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/28, F02C9/52 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
F02C9/28 (EP,US);
F02C9/52 (EP,US);
F05D2200/13 (EP,US);
F05D2200/211 (EP,US);
F05D2270/051 (EP,US);
F05D2270/09 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/06] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem für ein Mantelgebläse-Gasturbinentriebwerk | [1998/22] | English: | Control system for a ducted fan gas turbine engine | [1998/22] | French: | Système de contrôle pour turboréacteur à soufflante carenée | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00121945.0 / EP1069296 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US5622045 (WEIMER MATTHEW M [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3854287 (REMBOLD J) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4159625 (KERR WALTER B) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3750465 (HOWELL J, et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4104876 (LARSEN HALS NORMAN, et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4248042 (LARSEN HALS N, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US3925980 (MCCOMBS HOWARD L) [A] 7 * abstract * |