EP0838798 - Interactive learning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Education Corporation 2601 Main Street Irvine California 92714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states National Education Corporation 2601 Main Street Irvine, California 92714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
L'Allier, James 490 Fox Trail Drive Batavia, Illinois 60510 / US | 02 /
Welsh, Sally 1135 North Main Street Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US | 03 /
Nielsen, Boyd 734 Walnut Street Batavia, Illinois 60510 / US | 04 /
Miles, Kurt 423 North Avenue Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US | 05 /
Myers, Ken 1118 Greensfield Drive Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US | 06 /
Henrie, Stephen 6427 Halsey Road Woodridge, Illinois 60517 / US | 07 /
Norberg, Michael 1713 White Place Road Downers Grove, Illinois 60516 / US | 08 /
Helliwell, Laura 241 Elmwood Road Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308489.0 | 24.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | US19960738038 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: US 738038 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838798 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09B7/04, G09B7/06 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
G09B7/04 (EP,US);
G09B7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/09] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | ||
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Interaktive Lernsysteme | [1998/18] | English: | Interactive learning systems | [1998/18] | French: | Systèmes interactifs d'apprentissage | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 23.03.1999 | Observations by third parties | 04.07.2000 | Observations by third parties | 11.10.2000 | Observations by third parties | 19.03.2001 | Observations by third parties | 09.07.2001 | Observations by third parties | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0710942 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0710943 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5437553 (COLLINS DEBORAH L [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5618182 (THOMAS C DOUGLASS [US]) [PX] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5267865 (LEE JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5489213 (MAKIPAA JUHA [US]) [A] 1,4-7 * the whole document * | other | US5180309 | US6039575 | US4798543 | - ROBERT D.TENNYSON, "Use of Adaptive Information for Advisement in Learning Concepts and Rules Using Computer-Assisted Instructions", AMERICAN EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH JOURNAL, (1981), vol. 18, pages 425 - 438, XP000847559 | - W.ROTHEN AND D.TENNYSON, "Application of Bayes' Theory in Designing Computer - Based Adaptive Instructional Strategies", EDUCATIONAL PSYCHOLOGIST, (1978), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 317 - 323, XP000847560 | - E.STEINBERG, "Review of Student Control in Computer - Assisted Instruction", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER - BASED INSTRUCTION, (1977), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 84 - 90 | - AICC CMI SUBCOMMITTEE, CMI GUIDELINES FOR INTEROPERABILITY AICC, (19931025), XP000847561 | - AICC COURSEWARE TECHNOLOGY SUBCOMMITTEE, GLOSSARY OF TERMS RELATED TO COMPUTER-BASED TRAINING, (19921020), XP000847562 | - JAMES J. L'ALLIER ET AL, "The NETg Mastery Test Strategy", DISCUSSION PAPERS, (19950402), pages 1 - 12, XP000847563 | - JAMES J. L'ALLIER AND KURT W. MILES, "The Skill Builder Philosophy: Learning by Design", DISCUSSION PAPERS, (19960109), pages 1 - 11, XP000847564 | - DENNIS V.E. & GRUNER D., "Computer Managed Instruction at Arthur Andersen & Company - Status Report", EDUCATIONAL TECHNOLOGY, (199203), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 7 - 16, XP002932311 | - "Algorithms for Student Asessment - Formalizing Instruction Evaluation", VENEZKY R. & OSIN L., THE INTELLIGENT DESIGN OF COMPUTER-ASSISTED INSTRUCTION, LONGMAN PUBLISHING GROUP, (1991), pages 165 - 188, ISBN 0-8013-0390-7, XP002932312 | - "Four Types of Criterion-Referenced Test and Their Users - Protest", DICK W. & CAREY L., THE SYSTEMATIC DESIGN OF INSTRUCTION, SCOTT, FORESMAND AND COMPANY, (1985), vol. 2, pages 109 - 110, ISBN 0-673-18070-0, XP002932313 | - "Preassessment", KIBLER R.J. ET AL, OBJECTIVES FOR INSTRUCTION AND EVALUATION, BOSTON, ALLYN AND BACON INC., (1974), pages 65 - 71, XP002932314 | - PAULSON, R.F., CONTROL DATA PLATO SYSTEM OVERVIEW; A MULTIMEDIA COMPUTER-BASED EDUCATIONAL DELIVERY SYSTEM, MINNESOTA, USA, (1976), pages 1-1 - 6-5, XP002945797 | - CONTROL DATA CORPORATION, CONTROL DATA PLATO CMI AUTHOR'S GUIDE, MINNESOTA, USA, (1978), pages 1-1 - F-2, XP002943398 | - "CDC PHILOSOPHY", BROCHURE PLATO, XX, XX, XX, (19820101), pages 01 - 21, XP002945798 |