EP0840257 - Illumination and shadow simulation in a computer graphics/imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 720 Vandenberg Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Harry Charles 110 Lamorak Lane Maitland, Florida 32751 / US | 02 /
Steiner, Walter Robert 1790 Turtle Hill Road Enterprise, Florida 32725 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Körber, Wolfhart Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/44] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/19] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308568.1 | 28.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | US19960741421 | 29.10.1996 Original published format: US 741421 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0840257 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0840257 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0840257 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840257 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/50 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
G06T15/506 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/36] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beleuchtungs- und Schattensimulation in einem computergestützten graphischen oder Bilderzeugungssystem | [1998/19] | English: | Illumination and shadow simulation in a computer graphics/imaging system | [1998/19] | French: | Simulation d'éclairage et d'ombres dans un système graphique/d'imagerie par ordinateur | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2003 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.10.2011 | [2012/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5083287 (OBATA KOEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 52 * [Y] 5,10; | [XA]EP0553973 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 10 - line 55 * * page 10, line 5 - line 19; figures 4C2,,5 * [A] 6-9; | [Y] - KNIGHT S, "REAL TIME VISUAL SIMULATION CLUES AND SCENE ANTI-ALIASING", COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW,US,WESTWORLD PRODUCTION CO. LOS ANGELES, (1991), vol. 10, no. 16, ISSN 0278-9647, pages 108 - 114, XP000204583 [Y] 5,10 * page 110, column M, line 12 - line 32 * * page 114, column L, line 54 - column M, line 5 * | [A] - NAKAMAE E ET AL, "COMPOSITING 3D IMAGES WITH ANTIALIASING AND VARIOUS SHADING EFFECTS", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19890301), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 0272-1716, pages 21 - 29, XP000115873 [A] 4 * page 26, column L, line 3 - line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.19048 |