EP0839930 - Apparatus for vacuum line cleaning in substrate processing equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue, M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pang, Ben 6211 Mathieu Avenue Oakland, California 94618 / US | 02 /
Cheung, David 235 Billingsgate Lane Foster City, California 94404 / US | 03 /
Taylor, William N., Jr. 6977 Maple Drive Dublin, California 94568 / US | 04 /
Raoux, Sebastien 18 Lansing Street No. 304 San Francisco, California 94105 / US | 05 /
Fodor, Mark 107 Oak Rim Court No. 29 Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/19] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308660.6 | 29.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | US19960741230 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: US 741230 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839930 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839930 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44, B01D45/06, B01D53/46, B01D53/32 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B01J19/08 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B01D45/06 (EP,US);
B01D53/32 (EP,US);
B01D53/46 (EP,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
B01J19/126 (EP,US);
B01J19/249 (EP,US);
C23C16/4405 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
H01J37/3244 (EP,US);
H01J37/32844 (EP,US);
H05H1/46 (EP,US);
H05H1/4622 (EP,US);
H05H1/4652 (EP,US);
B01D2257/206 (EP,US);
B01D2259/818 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2453 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2458 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2461 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2467 (EP,US);
B01J2219/247 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2474 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2475 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2487 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2493 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2496 (EP,US);
H01J2237/022 (EP,US);
H05H2245/17 (EP,US);
Y02C20/30 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reinigungsvorrichtung für Vakuumleitung in einer Substrat-Bearbeitungsvorrichtung | [1998/19] | English: | Apparatus for vacuum line cleaning in substrate processing equipment | [1998/19] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage d'un tube à vide dans un dispositif de traitement de substrate | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 09.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0289858 (ULVAC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 51 * * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 17 * * column 11, line 39 - column 13, line 46; figures 1,3-17 *; | [X]JPH01288355 ; | [X]US5211729 (SHERMAN ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 11 - line 46 * * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 39; figures 2-6 *; | [X]JPH05202474 ; | [PX]EP0781599 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0767254 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [PX] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE19601436 (STRAEMKE SIEGFRIED DR ING [DE]) [PX] 1-3 * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 41; figure .; claims 1-22 *; | [PX]JPH0910544 ; | [A]EP0296720 (CHIU KIN CHUNG RAY) [A] 4-6 * page 3, line 19 - line 56; figures 1-5; claims 1-10 *; | [A]JPH02125876 ; | [A]DE4319118 (BREITBARTH FRIEDRICH WILHELM D [DE], et al) [A] 4-6 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 01, Database accession no. 90-004633, XP002055384 & JPH01288355 A 19891120 (MASUDA S) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931130), vol. 017, no. 644, Database accession no. (C - 1134), & JP05202474 A 19930810 (HITACHI ELECTRON ENG CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 12, Database accession no. 97-126931, XP002055385 & JPH0910544 A 19970114 (APLHATECH KK) [PX] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900724), vol. 014, no. 342, Database accession no. (C - 0743), & JP02125876 A 19900514 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 4-6 * abstract * |