EP0841485 - Variable flow pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOBOURN AUTOMOTIVE LIMITED Temple Farm Works, Priory Road, Strood Rochester Kent ME2 2BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states HOBOURN AUTOMOTIVE LIMITED Temple Farm Works, Priory Road, Strood Rochester, Kent ME2 2BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brighton, Derek Keith, Hobourn Automotive Ltd. Temple Farm Works, Priory Road Strood, Rochester, Kent, ME2 2BD / GB | 02 /
Baseley, Simon John, Hobourn Automotive Ltd. Temple Farm Works, Priory Road Strood, Rochester, Kent, ME2 2BD / GB | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Perkins, Sarah Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308922.0 | 06.11.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | GB19960023453 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9623453 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841485 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841485 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/04 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
F04C14/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1999/04] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pumpe mit regelbarer Durchflussmenge | [1998/20] | English: | Variable flow pump | [1998/20] | French: | Pompe à débit variable | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 14.11.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT | 25.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.01.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2001 | NL | 17.10.2001 | SE | 17.01.2002 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/27] | SE | 17.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1000591 (WILHELM STIEBER) [X] 1-5,7-9 * page 1, line 74 - page 2, line 119; figures 1,2,4 * * page 3, line 1 - line 41; figures 5,6 *; | [X]DE2109112 (ROBERT BOSCH) [X] 1-6,8,9* page 2, paragraph L - page 5, line 12; figure - * |