EP0885976 - Electrowinning of high purity zinc metal from a Mn-containing leach solution preceded by cold electrolytic demanganization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulfacid S.A.I.F.C. Av. Cordoba 883, 11th Floor (C1054AAH) 1010 Buenos Aires / AR | [2002/10] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Sulfacid S.A.I.F.C. Cerrito 836, 5th Floor 1010 Buenos Aires / AR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fussi, Jose Luis San Martin Ave. 1758 (2156) Fray Luis Bertran, Santa Fe / AR | 02 /
Quintero, Oscar San Martin Ave. 1758 (2156) Fray Luis Bertran, Santa Fe / AR | 03 /
Cornaglia, Aldo San Martin Ave. 1758 (2156) Fray Luis Bertran, Santa Fe / AR | 04 /
Morosini, Carlos San Martin Ave. 1758 (2156) Fray Luis Bertran, Santa Fe / AR | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Jenkins, Peter David PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309299.2 | 19.11.1997 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | AR20100273397 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: AR 10273397 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885976 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885976 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22B19/20, C25C1/16, C25B1/00, C25C7/00, C25C7/06 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
C22B19/26 (EP);
C25B1/21 (EP);
C25C1/16 (EP);
C25C7/00 (EP);
C25C7/06 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1999/35] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrolytische Gewinnung von Reinzink aus einer Mangan enthaltenden Laugungslösung durch vorhergehender Entmanganisierung der Lösung mittels kalter Elektrolyse | [1998/52] | English: | Electrowinning of high purity zinc metal from a Mn-containing leach solution preceded by cold electrolytic demanganization | [1998/52] | French: | Production électrolytique de zinc métallique pur à partir de solutions zincifères contaminées en manganèse précédée d'une démanganisation électrolytique à l'état froid | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4071421 (MASTERS IAN M, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 60; figures 1,2; examples IV-VII * * column 11, line 10 - line 32 *; | [Y]US3065155 (WELSH JAY Y) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 12; figures 1-3,6,7; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3014511 (NAT INST METALLURG) [Y] 1,2 * figure 1; claims 1,15,16 *; | [A]EP0066024 (SHERRITT GORDON MINES LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 9-11 * | [Y] - VERBAAN B. & MULLINDER B., "Simultaneous electrowinning of manganese dioxide and zinc from purified neutral zinc sulphate at high current efficiencies", HYDROMETALLURGY, Amsterdam, nl, (1981), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 339 - 352, XP002078636 [Y] 1,2 * page 342 - page 345; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-386X(81)90031-1 |