EP0846457 - Long term care bed controls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILL-ROM, INC. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville Indiana 47006-9167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states HILL-ROM, INC. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, Indiana 47006-9167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brooke, Jason C. 2004 Davant Circle Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 / US | 02 /
Hakamiun, Reza 67 Three Pence Lane Charleston, SC 29414 / US | 03 /
Mutka, Michael J. 8522 Kennestone Lane North Charleston, SC 29420 / US | 04 /
Thomas, James F. 1286 Hidden Lakes Drive Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 / US | 05 /
Larisey, William S., Jr. 105 New Spring Court Summerville, SC 29483 / US | 06 /
Shows, Kendall O. 541 Simmons Avenue Summerville, SC 29483 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309438.6 | 21.11.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | US19960770547 | 03.12.1996 Original published format: US 770547 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846457 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846457 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
A61G7/0507 (EP,US);
A61G7/012 (EP,US);
A61G7/018 (EP,US);
A61G7/0509 (EP,US);
A61G7/0513 (EP,US);
A61G7/0516 (EP,US);
A61G7/0518 (EP,US);
A61G7/0522 (EP,US);
A61G7/0524 (EP,US);
A61G7/0528 (EP,US);
A61G7/053 (EP,US);
A61G2203/723 (EP,US);
A61G7/015 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/01] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtungen für Langzeit-Pflegebett | [1998/24] | English: | Long term care bed controls | [1998/24] | French: | Commandes pour lit de soins de longue durée | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/32] | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.12.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2712366 (SKUPAS JOHN A) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]BE741390 (FAVRO) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US4751754 (BAILEY DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 17* column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 13; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US4932090 (JOHANSSON PAUL J [US]) [A] 9,10,12-14 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]US5084925 (COOK STUART A [US]) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [A]US5384927 (MARDERO STEVE [CA], et al) [A] 9,12-15 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2722017 | US3585659 | US3711876 | US4097939 | US4097940 | US5083334 | US5248562 | US5317769 | US5347682 |