EP0848943 - Process for increased flavor impact in oral care products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgess, Steven Carl 3517 Maple Avenue Sharonville, Ohio 45241 / US | 02 /
Upson, James Grigg 11268 Springfield Pike Springdale, Ohio 45246 / US | 03 /
Sanker, Lowell Alan 7609 Carriage Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Departmen Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Departmen, Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [1998/26] | Woof, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Patent Department, Lovett House, Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309521.9 | 26.11.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | US19960756450 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: US 756450 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848943 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K7/20 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhaltung eines Aromas mit erhöhter Intensität in Mundpflegemitteln | [1998/26] | English: | Process for increased flavor impact in oral care products | [1998/26] | French: | Procédé d'obtention d'un arôme intensifié dans les produits pour soins bucaux | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/42] | 24.05.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU492521B (PORT DENTAL LABORATORIES) [A] 1-5,10 * claims 1,3,9 * * page 5 *; | [A]EP0288420 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * claims 1,2,15 * * example 1 *; | [A]US4925655 (SMIGEL IRWIN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,9,10 * claims 1,2 * * column 2, lines 11-45 ** column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 8 * |