EP0845893 - Telephone data input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Akihiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309538.3 | 26.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | JP19960319251 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31925196 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0845893 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0845893 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] |
Former [2004/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0845893 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2004/18] | |||
[2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/247 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
H04M1/2748 (EP,US);
H04M1/233 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/2747 (EP,US);
H04M2250/70 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | H04M1/274, H04M1/247 | ||
Former IPC [1998/23] | H04M1/274 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/16] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Eingabevorrichtung für Fernsprechdaten | [1998/23] | English: | Telephone data input device | [1998/23] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée de données téléphoniques | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 20.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2012199 (BANISTER, CECIL H. AND LE DAIN, TIMON M.) [X] 6-8* the whole document *; | [X]WO9314589 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9-13 * page 3, line 1 - page 3, line 12 * * page 3, line 29 - page 16, line 32 *; | [XY]EP0588210 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 6,7,14-16 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 3 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 35 * * figure 8 * [Y] 20; | [XY]EP0679003 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 6-8 * column 1, line 53 - column 3, line 4 * * column 11, line 23 - column 15, line 6 * * figure 6 * [Y] 20; | [X]EP0715441 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 38 * * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 52 * |