EP0848410 - Image intensifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | ||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 435 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hideki 495, Wada-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 435 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Minoru Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 435 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Masuo Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 435 / JP | 04 /
Ishihara, Yoshitoshi Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 435 / JP | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309951.8 | 10.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | JP19960346708 | 10.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34670896 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848410 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848410 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/89, G02B6/08 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G02B6/08 (EP,US);
H01J29/385 (EP,US);
H01J29/892 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildverstärker | [1998/25] | English: | Image intensifier | [1998/25] | French: | Intensificateur d'images | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4886537 (PATRICK E VINCENT [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 3 - line 50; figures 1A,4 *; | [XA]EP0170310 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 5,6 * page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 30; figures 2,4 * [A] 1,3; | [XA]US4264408 (BENHAM JAMES D) [X] 5,6 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 * [A] 1-4; | [XA]US4647811 (GALVES JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 5,6 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 6; figure 3 * [A] 1-4 |