EP0849776 - A method of manufacturing an insulated-gate field effect transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Jiann 9107 Silverdollar Trail Irving, Texas 75063 / US | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310138.9 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | US19960033655P | 17.12.1996 Original published format: US 33655 P | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849776 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849776 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L21/336 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
H01L29/6659 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/28052 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/4933 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7833 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/34] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Feldeffektransistors mit isoliertem Gate | [1998/26] | English: | A method of manufacturing an insulated-gate field effect transistor | [1998/26] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un transistor à effet de champ à grille isolée | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2001 | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4128670 (GAENSSLEN FRITZ H); | [A]US4886764 (MILLER ROBERT O [US], et al); | [A]EP0471185 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5569947 (IWASA SHOICHI [JP], et al) |