EP0851414 - Optical pickup device and optical recording medium driving apparatus comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tajiri, Atsushi 2-19-17 Toudaiji, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka-fu 618 / JP | 02 /
Goto, Takenori 4-6-12-1002, Kikusui-dori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Yasuaki 2-E1-504, Takenodai Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617 / JP | 04 /
Mori, Kazushi 19-8-902, Shakusonji-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573 / JP | 05 /
Sawada, Minoru 8-9, Kohsho, Hashimoto Yawata-shi, Kyoto-fu, 614 / JP | 06 /
Ibaraki, Akira 2-19-11, Kuzuha-Asahi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573 / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310537.2 | 23.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960348679 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34867996 | JP19970038225 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3822597 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851414 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851414 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, H01L33/00 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/123 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/127 (EP,US);
G11B7/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/27] | G11B7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/24] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Abtastvorrichtung und Abspielgerät | [1998/27] | English: | Optical pickup device and optical recording medium driving apparatus comprising the same | [1998/27] | French: | Tête de lecture optique et lecteur de supports d'enregistrement | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6032143 ; | [X]JPS5933641 ; | [X]JPH02189733 ; | [A]JPS6195574 ; | [A]JPS6236752 ; | [A]US4877756 (YAMAMOTO ISAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1,42 * the whole document *; | [A]US5005162 (MITSUMORI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 38,43* figure 6; claim 1 *; | [A]US5130531 (ITO YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,42 * column 12; figures 4,16 *; | [X]EP0513908 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5285062 (LEE WAI-HON [US]) [A] 38,43 * figure 10; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850702), vol. 009, no. 157, Database accession no. (P - 369), & JP60032143 A 19850219 (NEC HOME ELECTRONICS KK) [X] 1,42 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840615), vol. 008, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 280), & JP59033641 A 19840223 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,42 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901016), vol. 014, no. 474, Database accession no. (P - 1117), & JP02189733 A 19900725 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRON CO) [X] 1,42 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860916), vol. 010, no. 272, Database accession no. (E - 437), & JP61095574 A 19860514 (OPUTOSU:KK) [A] 1,42 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870716), vol. 011, no. 219, Database accession no. (P - 596), & JP62036752 A 19870217 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 38,43 * abstract * |