EP0850718 - Process for linear friction welding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trask, Richard D. 10 Nod Brook Drive Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | 02 /
Goetschius, Susan H. 93 Jones Hollow Road Marlborough, Connecticut 06447 / US | 03 /
Hilton, Stephen A. 93 Range Hill Road Vernon, Connecticut 06066 / US | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310560.4 | 23.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | US19960772536 | 24.12.1996 Original published format: US 772536 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850718 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850718 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
B23K20/1205 (EP,US);
F01D5/3061 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
F05D2230/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/12] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahrem zum Linearreibschweissen | [1998/27] | English: | Process for linear friction welding | [1998/27] | French: | Procédé de soudage par friction | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 05.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2003 | Decision despatched | 12.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2277896 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [A]EP0624418 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0669183 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 15-20 * column 1, line 44 - line 51 * * column 2, line 7 - line 14 * * column 2, line 30 - line 40 * * column 3, line 46 - line 33 * * abstract * [A] 1-14,21 |