EP0851681 - Image and data display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/27] | Image and data display method and apparatus | ||
[2002/46] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagawa, Yuichi 2762-205, Naracho, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Morioka, Michio 6-Higashi 2-201 Hikarigaoka-1-chome, Kashiwa-shi / JP | 03 /
Hirasawa, Shigeki 17-12-A507, Yutakacho Sagamihara-shi / JP | 04 /
Kuwabara, Tadashi 34-1-106, Shirane-4chome, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 05 /
Ozaki, Tomochika 226 Grotto Irvine. CA / US | 06 /
Yajima, Akio 18-26, Shoan-3-chome, Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310573.7 | 24.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960345001 | 25.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34500196 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0851681 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851681 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N5/445 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/43074 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N7/0122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Bildern und Daten | [2002/46] | English: | Image and data display apparatus | [2002/46] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'image et de données | [2002/46] |
Former [1998/27] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Bildern und Daten | ||
Former [1998/27] | Image and data display method and apparatus | ||
Former [1998/27] | Méthode et dispositif d'affichage d'image et de données | Examination procedure | 13.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121810.4 / EP1170944 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2004
25.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2004
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 22.04.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.08.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.09.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/18] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0742670 (VIDEO JUKEBOX NETWORK INC [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13 * column 5, line 12 - line 49 ** column 7, line 40 - line 52 * |