EP0850959 - Method for producing methyl methacrylate polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriya, Osamu 1-5-38, Uehara-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | 02 /
Yano, Koji 2-3-633, Ikku-cho, Niihama-shi Ehime / JP | 03 /
Morisada, Ikuo 2-3-623, Ikku-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | [1998/32] |
Former [1998/27] | 01 /
Moriya, Osamu 1-5-38, Uehara-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | ||
02 /
Yano, Koji 20-1-142, Hoshigoe-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | |||
03 /
Morisada, Ikuo 2-3-623, Ikku-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310575.2 | 24.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960348931 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34893196 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850959 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850959 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/00, C08F2/38, C08F20/12 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
C08F6/001 (EP,KR,US);
C08F120/14 (KR);
C08F2/02 (KR);
C08F2/04 (KR);
C08F2/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08F20/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/001, C08L33/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Methylmethacrylatpolymers | [1998/27] | English: | Method for producing methyl methacrylate polymer | [1998/27] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un polymère de méthacrylate de méthyle | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1234588 (AKZO) [A] 1* page 3, line 79 - line 88; claim - *; | [A]US4068061 (NAKAGAWA TOSHIMI, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4324868 (MAEDA TORU) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0691351 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 30 - line 33 * |