EP0863023 - Double-chuck mechanical pencil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOTOBUKI & CO., LTD. 13 Nishi Kurisu-cho Shichiku Kita-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states KOTOBUKI & CO., LTD. 13 Nishi Kurisu-cho Shichiku Kita-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuya, Yoshihide, c/o Kotobuki & Co., Ltd. Kawagoe Fact., 138, Oaza Kujirai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Anzai, Shouji, c/o Kotobuki & Co., Ltd. Kawagoe Fact., 138, Oaza Kujirai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Kageyama, Hidehei, c/o Kotobuki & Co., Ltd. Kawagoe Fact., 138, Oaza Kujirai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/37] | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310618.0 | 24.12.1997 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | JP19970061754 | 03.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6175497 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863023 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0863023 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863023 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B43K21/22, B43K21/12, B43K29/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
B43K21/20 (EP);
B43K21/00 (KR);
B43K21/22 (KR);
B43K29/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/37] | B43K21/22, B43K21/12 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Füllminenstift mit zwei Spannbacken | [1998/37] | English: | Double-chuck mechanical pencil | [1998/37] | French: | Porte-mine à deux pinces de serrage | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.03.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | GB | 24.12.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/01] | ES | 30.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0715968 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4,11 * column 13, line 18 - line 25 * * column 15, line 18 - line 28 * * column 15, line 56 - column 16, line 4; figures 2,9,19,21 *; | [Y]EP0321581 (PENTEL KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4,11 * page 5, line 15 - page 13, line L; figure - *; | [A]US5018891 (KAGEYAMA HIDEHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,11 * abstract *; | [AP]US5683191 (KAGEYAMA SHUHEI [JP], et al) [AP] 1,3,11 * column 2, line 36 - line 67 * * column 7, line 4 - column 18, line 30; figure - * |