EP0850716 - Manufacturing method of a wire electrode for electro-discharge machining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/27] | Wire electrode for electro-discharge machining and manufacturing method thereof | ||
[2001/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Yoshihiro, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Kenji, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Kouichi, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Inazawa, Shinji, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Ezaki, Shigeo, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Kume, Toshihiro, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310624.8 | 24.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960347008 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34700896 | JP19970193586 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19358697 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850716 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850716 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/08 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
B23H7/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Drahtelektrode zum Funkenerodieren | [2001/26] | English: | Manufacturing method of a wire electrode for electro-discharge machining | [2001/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un fil-électrode pour usinage par électroérosion | [2001/26] |
Former [1998/27] | Drahtelektrode zum Funkenerodieren und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [1998/27] | Wire electrode for electro-discharge machining and manufacturing method thereof | ||
Former [1998/27] | Fil-électrode pour usinage par électroérosion et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 07.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 17.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0526361 (TREFIMETAUX [FR]) [X] 1,2,15,17 * page 2, line 33 - line 44 * * page 3, line 9 - line 25 * * page 3, line 46 - line 53 * * page 5, line 6 - line 7 * * page 5, line 40 - line 50 * * page 6, line 9 - line 15 * * page 6, line 48 - line 52 * * abstract * [A] 3,16; | [XA]EP0734805 (THERMOCOMPACT SA [FR]) [X] 4-8,10,12 * column 2, line 17 - line 36 * * column 3, line 13 - line 36 * * column 5, line 18 - line 29 * * abstract * [A] 9,11,13,14; | [X]US4935594 (GROOS HEINRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,15,17 * column 2, line 20 - line 34 * * claims 8-20 *; | [X]JPS6318072 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880624), vol. 012, no. 223, Database accession no. (C - 507), & JP63018072 A 19880125 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [X] 4,6,7,10,12 * abstract * |