EP0854589 - Adaptive antenna diversity receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akaiwa, Yoshihiko 1-21-2, Hinosato Munakata-shi, Fukuoka 811-34 / JP | 02 /
Miyahara, Shunji 615-20, Imajuku-higashi-chou, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241 / JP | 03 /
Morishima, Mitsunori 18-9 Funjimigaoka, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224 / JP | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310739.4 | 31.12.1997 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | US19970782187 | 16.01.1997 Original published format: US 782187 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854589 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854589 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
H04B7/0874 (EP,US);
H04B1/1081 (EP,US);
H04B7/0848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2001/05] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Adaptiver Empfänger mit Antennendiversity | [1998/30] | English: | Adaptive antenna diversity receiver | [1998/30] | French: | Récepteur adaptatif avec diversité d'antenne | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/34] | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5455844 (ISHIKAWA HIROYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 59 * |