EP0789086 - Process for preparing a metallic material having high hardness and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Calvar, Marc 11 avenue de la Redoute 92600 Asnieres / FR | 02 /
Deneuville, Jean-Louis 18, rue de la Turlurette 58160 Sauvigny les Bois / FR | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400093.7 | 16.01.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | FR19960001093 | 30.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9601093 | [1997/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0789086 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0789086 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, C22C33/02, B22F3/15 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
C22C1/0433 (EP);
B22F3/15 (EP);
C22C33/0285 (EP);
B22F2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines metallischen Materials mit hoher Härte und seine Verwendung | [1997/33] | English: | Process for preparing a metallic material having high hardness and its use | [1997/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un matériau métallique de grande dureté et utilisations | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8604841 (ASEA STAL AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,14,15,18,20 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 32; claims 1,2 * [Y] 10; | [XY]JPH0347946 ; | [XY]JPH04185415 ; | [XY]JPH02200748 ; | [XY]JPH07216584 ; | [Y]FR1425774 (EUTECTIC WELDING ALLOYS) [Y] 4,5 * Abstract A.9 *; | [Y]US4401724 (MOSKOWITZ LARRY N [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 8, line 42 - line 49 *; | [Y]GB2005305 (CREUSOT LOIRE) [Y] 7,8 * page 1, line 55 - line 63; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0341643 (SEILSTORFER GMBH & CO METALLUR [DE]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * page 3, line 23 - line 34; claim 1 *; | JPH03277747 [ ] (HITACHI METALS LTD) [ ] * table 1.N *; | [Y]JPS6289843 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910515), vol. 015, no. 189, Database accession no. (C - 0831), & JP03047946 A 19910228 (NKK CORP) [X] 1,2,14,17-20 * abstract * [Y] 10 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 33, Database accession no. 92-272811, XP002016817 & JPH04185415 A 19920702 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1-4,6,14,15,17,20 * abstract * [Y] 5,7,8 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901023), vol. 014, no. 485, Database accession no. (C - 0772), & JP02200748 A 19900809 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [X] 1-4,17,20 * abstract * [Y] 5,7,8 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 41, Database accession no. 95-317944, XP002016818 & JPH07216584 A 19950815 (KUROKI KOGYOSHO KK) [X] 1-3,17,20 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7,8 | [A] - ITO, YUJI ET AL, "Sintered iron alloys for corrosion- and wear-resistant tools", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920713), vol. 117, no. 2, Database accession no. 12062, XP002044671 [A] 12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870925), vol. 011, no. 297, Database accession no. (C - 448), & JP62089843 A 19870424 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 10 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2405306 |