EP0788271 - Circuit arrangement for generation of metering pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nvidia International, Inc. Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael / BB | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klamt, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Ummilostrasse 6 31191 Algermissen / DE | 02 /
Bratschke, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Kardinal-von-Galen-Ring 10A 30823 Garbsen / DE | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nußbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Menzietti, Domenico, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1997/32] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Kabelkamp 20 30179 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 97400135.6 | 14.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | DE19961003530 | 01.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19603530 | [1997/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788271 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788271 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788271 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
H04M15/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung von Gebührenimpulsen | [1997/32] | English: | Circuit arrangement for generation of metering pulses | [1997/32] | French: | Agencement de circuit pour la génération d'impulsions de taxation | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | IT | 01.10.2008 | NL | 01.10.2008 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | ES | 12.01.2009 | AT | 14.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/30] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
AT | 14.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 01.10.2008 | |
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 12.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3516007 (ATES COMPONENTI ELETTRON [IT]) [DA] 1,2* abstract *; | [DA]DE3636563 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US4829517 (MALEK MONI [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]EP0668687 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 51 - line 55 * | by applicant | DE3636563 | DE3516007 |