EP0786359 - Documents guiding device for folding and/or inserting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allibert, Cédric 40, Avenue J.P.Bourquard 78500 Sartrouville / FR | 02 /
Bezelga, Christophe 143, rue Houdan 92330 Sceaux / FR | 03 /
Krasuski, Marek 17, rue Maréchal Galliéni 92260 Fontenay Aux Roses / FR | [1997/35] |
Former [1997/31] | 01 /
Allibert, Cédric 40, Avenue J.P.Bourquard 78500 Sartrouville / FR | ||
02 /
Bezelga, Christophe 7, avenue Général de Gaulle 77600 Bussy Saint Georges / FR | |||
03 /
Krasuski, Marek 17, rue Maréchal Galliéni 92260 Fontenay Aux Roses / FR | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400188.5 | 28.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | FR19960000979 | 29.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9600979 | [1997/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786359 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786359 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B43M5/04 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B43M5/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/31] | Title | German: | Dokumentenführungsvorrichtung für eine Falz- und/oder Kuvertiermaschine | [1997/31] | English: | Documents guiding device for folding and/or inserting apparatus | [1997/31] | French: | Dispositif de guidage de documents pour machine de pliage et/ou d'insertion | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0352692 (ALCATEL SATMAM [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5183526 (WALTER GEORGE E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5216472 (MUTO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2691703 (PITNEY BOWES PLC [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]EP0661175 (NEOPOST IND [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9522462 (PRINTED FORMS EQUIP [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line L; figure - * |