EP0858235 - Personal communications network for flexible traffic demand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanjuán, Flores Tomás Villa de Marin 26, 3.C 28029 Madrid / ES | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Herbert, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97400265.1 | 06.02.1997 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858235 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H04W92/12 (EP);
H04W76/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/33] | Title | German: | Persönliches Kommunikationsnetzwerk für flexible Verkehrsanfragen | [1998/33] | English: | Personal communications network for flexible traffic demand | [1998/33] | French: | Réseau de communication personnelles pour la demande de trafic flexible | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0534716 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 8 * * figure 4 *; | [X]WO9400959 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 8, line 4 - line 7 * * page 8, line 18 - line 21 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 3 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5454026 (TANAKA SHOJI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 38 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 35 ** figure 1 * |