EP0798223 - Food bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schisler, Jacques 22, Chemin des Graines 79100 Thouars / FR | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel, et al Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Bruder, Michel, et al Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400329.5 | 13.02.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | FR19960003689 | 25.03.1996 Original published format: FR 9603689 | [1997/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798223 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798223 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/00, B65D77/26 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
B65D77/26 (EP,US);
B65D33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittelbeutel | [1997/40] | English: | Food bag | [1997/40] | French: | Sac d'emballage destiné au transport de nourriture | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4708248 (DAVIS GEORGE H [US]) [AD] 1-9 * column W *; | [A]FR2155725 (GILLETTE CO) [A] 1,2,5,6 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3640380 (HUFFMAN WILLIAM W) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 21 - line 45; figure 3 *; | [A]US5441170 (BANE III WILLIAM W [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * column A *; | [A]US1456897 (MCGRATH CHARLES B) [A] 1,7,8 * column W *; | [A]US5071007 (KADIEN THOMAS G [US]) [A] 1 * column W * |