EP0795619 - Process for manufacturing a stainless ferritic steel with improved corrosion resistance, more particularly intergranular corrosion resistance and pitting corrosion resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UGINE SA Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states USINOR SA Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states USINOR Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states USINOR SACILOR Société Anonyme Immeuble "La Pacific", 11/13 Cours Valmy, La Défense 7 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauser, Jean-Michel 276 rue du 11 Novembre 73400 - Ugine / FR | 02 /
Haudrechy, Pascale 2031 route d'Annecy 73400 - Ugine / FR | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger Usinor Direction Propriété Industrielle Imeuble "La Pacific" 11/13 Cours Valmy 92070 La Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Ventavoli, Roger USINOR SACILOR, Direction Propriété Industrielle, Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy, TSA 10001 92070 La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400355.0 | 18.02.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | FR19960003258 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: FR 9603258 | [1997/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795619 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/44, C22C38/48 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung rostfreies ferritisches Stahl mit erhöhte Korrosionsbeständigkeit, insbesondere Beständigkeit gegen interkristalline Korrosion und gegen Lochfrasskorrosion | [1997/38] | English: | Process for manufacturing a stainless ferritic steel with improved corrosion resistance, more particularly intergranular corrosion resistance and pitting corrosion resistance | [1997/38] | French: | Procédé d'élaboration d'un acier inoxydable ferritique présentant une résistance à la corrosion améliorée, et notamment une résistance à la corrosion intergranulaire et par piqûre | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/29] | 13.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2349659 (CRUCIBLE INC [US]) [A] 1,3,6,7 * claims 1-3,5,6 *; | [A]FR2348275 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0478790 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,9 * claims 1-4 *; | [AD]DE3221087 (THYSSEN EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3221087 |