EP0794103 - Device for preventing rotation of the steering column body of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NACAM FRANCE SA Z.I. Sud, Route de Blois 41000 Vendôme / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states NACAM FRANCE SA Route de Blois 41100 Vendôme / FR | ||
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states LEMFORDER NACAM S.A. Zone Industrielle Sud, Route de Blois 41100 Vendome / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marzio, Emmanuel 2 Rue Saulnerie 41100 Vendome / FR | 02 /
Duval, Benoît 8 rue Lindbergh 41100 Vendome / FR | 03 /
Laisement, André 39 La Houghaise 41290 La Chapelle Encherie / FR | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux BP 405 78055 Saint Quentin en Yvelines Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400420.2 | 26.02.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | FR19960003010 | 06.03.1996 Original published format: FR 9603010 | [1997/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794103 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794103 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verhindern des Schwenkens des Lenksäulenkörpers eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1997/37] | English: | Device for preventing rotation of the steering column body of a motor vehicle | [1997/37] | French: | Dispositif antirotation de corps de colonne de direction de véhicule automobile | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 14.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0529769 (TORRINGTON CO [GB]) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 6-9; | [A]DE4034710 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0408847 |