EP0801240 - Axially movable transmission unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Automotive AG Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states GKN Automotive AG Hauptstrasse 150 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brossard, Jean-Claude 27, rue Dubois 78250 Meulan / FR | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400517.5 | 06.03.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | FR19960004618 | 12.04.1996 Original published format: FR 9604618 | [1997/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801240 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/06, B61C9/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
B61C9/00 (EP,KR);
F16D3/06 (EP,KR);
F16D3/065 (EP,KR);
F16D9/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/42] | Title | German: | Axialbewegliche Antriebseinheit | [1997/42] | English: | Axially movable transmission unit | [1997/42] | French: | Ensemble de transmission à mobilité axiale | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5186079 (GEE THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE1019187 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2169475 (GLAENZER SPICER SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2521666 (TERAMACHI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 12 * |