EP0810187 - Modifiers for water-setting inorganic compositions and modified water-setting inorganic compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/34] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maillet, Jerome, Elf Atochem Japan Kyoto Research Park, 1, Awatacho Chudoji, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto 600 / JP | 02 /
Miyaki, Yoshiyuki, Elf Atochem Japan Kyoto Research Park, 1, Awatacho Chudoji, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto 600 / JP | 03 /
Komornicki, Jacques, Elf Atochem Japan Kyoto Research Park, 1, Awatacho Chudoji, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto 600 / JP | [1997/49] | Application number, filing date | 97400551.4 | 13.03.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960137928 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13792896 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810187 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/26, C04B24/42 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B24/04 (KR);
C04B24/2664 (EP);
C04B24/2688 (EP);
C04B24/42 (EP);
C04B2111/27 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B22/062, C04B24/2664, C04B24/42, C04B40/0039 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B24/122, C04B24/2664, C04B24/42, C04B40/0039 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/49] | Title | German: | Veränderungsmittel für hydraulisch abbindende Massen und veränderte hydraulisch abbindende Massen | [1997/49] | English: | Modifiers for water-setting inorganic compositions and modified water-setting inorganic compositions | [1997/49] | French: | Modificateur pour matériaux à prise hydraulique et matériaux à prise hydraulique modifiés | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/51] | 19.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07330411 ; | [YD]JPH02160651 ; | [YD]JPH0215511B ; | [Y]US3578488 (OHLHAUSEN HOWARD GARY) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10 * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 37 * * column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, line 70 - column 5, line 75 * * claims 1,9,13 *; | [A]US4341560 (SAITO MASUMI, et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 31 *; | [A]EP0244500 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 19 - page 2, line 32 * * page 3, line 23 - page 3, line 57 *; | [Y]EP0384322 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10 * page 2, column 24 - page 2, column 40 * * page 3, line 18 - page 3, line 32 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 08, Database accession no. 96-074609, XP002039779 & JPH07330411 A 19951219 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10 * abstract * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900910), vol. 014, no. 417, Database accession no. (C - 0756), & JP02160651 A 19900620 (TORAY DOW CORNING SILICONE CO LTD) [YD] 1,6 * abstract * | [YD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 19, Database accession no. 83-16106K, XP002039780 & JPH0215511B B2 19900412 (OSAKA PACKING SEIZOSHO KK) [YD] 1,6 * abstract * |