EP0798464 - Process and plant for treating atmospheric air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fillet, Frédéric 12, rue de Fleury 92140 Clamart / FR | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Brevets et Marques, 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400670.2 | 25.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | FR19960003808 | 27.03.1996 Original published format: FR 9603808 | [1997/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798464 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/00, B01D53/22 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
B01D53/22 (EP,US);
F04C29/0007 (EP,US);
Y10S55/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, NL [1997/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Behandlung athmosphärischer Luft | [1997/40] | English: | Process and plant for treating atmospheric air | [1997/40] | French: | Procédé et installation de traitement d'air atmosphérique | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 05.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/23] | 15.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/23] | Request for further processing for: | 01.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.1998 | Decision despatched | 11.05.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 17.07.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0330555 (ZIMMERN BERNARD [US]) [A] 1,7 * figure 1; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US3820350 (BRANDIN T, et al) [A] 7 * figure 1; claim 1 * |