EP0808776 - Reclosable pouch and zipper therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025-5811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malin, Art 1840 Smith Road Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401103.3 | 20.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | US19960651977 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: US 651977 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808776 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808776 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/25 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B65D33/2533 (EP,US);
B31B70/8133 (EP,US);
Y10S24/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI [1997/48] | Title | German: | Wiederverschliessbarer Beutel mit komplementären Profilverschlussstreifen | [1997/48] | English: | Reclosable pouch and zipper therefor | [1997/48] | French: | Sachet refermable avec bande de fermeture à profilés d'accouplement | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | CH | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | [2003/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3685562 (AUSNIT STEVEN); | [A]EP0450958 (MAYER OSKAR FOODS [US]) [A] 1-3,6-9,11,13 * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 12; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5118203 (ANDRONICO DAVID J [US]) [A] 1-3,7,9,11,13 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0516393 (GEN FOODS INC [US]) [A] 12,16,17,19,20,22,24 * column 5, lines 17-31; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0621197 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 14,21 * column 3, lines 16-37; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5461845 (YEAGER JAMES W [US]) [AD] 14,21 * column 4, lines 52-59; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5470156 (MAY TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 1-5,7,9-11,13,23 * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 6; figures 1-10 * |