EP0812649 - Method of producing a hollow turbine blade and multiple effect furnace-press for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA MOTEURS 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2002/12] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION Snecma 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergue, Jean-Pierre Serges 3, place Auguste Renoir 95230 - Soisy/Montmorency / FR | 02 /
Bichon, Mathieu Philippe Albert 1, rue Jean Moulin 95120 - Ermont / FR | 03 /
Lacuisse, Jean-François Georges Julien 20, rue de la Tour Billy 95100 - Argenteuil / FR | 04 /
Lorieux, Alain Georges Henri 93, Bd Charles de Gaulle 95110 - Sannois / FR | [2001/48] |
Former [1997/51] | 01 /
Bergue, Jean-Pierre Serges 3, place Auguste Renoir 95230 - Soisy/Montmorency / FR | ||
02 /
Bichon, Mathieu Philippe Albert 1, rue Jean Moulin 95120 - Ermont / FR | |||
03 /
Lacuisse, Jean-François Georges Julien 20, rue de la Tour Billy 95100 - Argenteuil / FR | |||
04 /
Lorieux, Alain Georges Henri 93, Bd Charles de Gaule 95110 - Sannois / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401325.2 | 12.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | FR19960007329 | 13.06.1996 Original published format: FR 9607329 | [1997/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812649 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812649 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/04, B21D26/02, B21D53/78 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
B21J9/02 (EP,US);
B21D22/20 (EP,US);
B21D22/26 (EP,US);
B21K3/04 (EP,US);
B23P15/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49336 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49339 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/35] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer hohlen Turbinenschaufel und mehrstufiger Druckofen zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2001/48] | English: | Method of producing a hollow turbine blade and multiple effect furnace-press for carrying out the method | [1997/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une aube creuse de turbomachine et presse-four à multiple effet utilisée dans sa mise en oeuvre | [1997/51] |
Former [1997/51] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer hohlen Turbinenschaufel und mehrstufige Druckofen zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | Examination procedure | 30.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8102128 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]GB2096513 (SUPERFORM METALS LTD) [A] 11* figure - *; | [DA]EP0700738 (SNECMA [FR]) [DA] 1-9,11 * column 7, line 20 - line 40; figure -; claims 1,10-13 * |