EP0814575 - Equalizer-combiner for a diversity receiver, receiver and corresponding diversity reception method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL TELSPACE 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cédex / FR | [1997/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Joel 6 Chemin des Bonnes Vignes 95150 Taverny / FR | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/21] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL, Département Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/52] | Feray, Valérie c/o Alcatel Alsthom Recherche IPD, 30, avenue Kléber 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401326.0 | 12.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | FR19960007750 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: FR 9607750 | [1997/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814575 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04B7/005 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04B7/0851 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/37] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entzerrer-Kombinator für einen Diversity-Empfänger, Empfänger und zugehöriges Verfahren zum Diversity-Empfang | [1997/52] | English: | Equalizer-combiner for a diversity receiver, receiver and corresponding diversity reception method | [1997/52] | French: | Egaliseur-combineur, pour récepteur en diversité, récepteur et procédé de réception en diversité correspondant | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 28.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/28] | 23.02.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0631399 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * abrégé *; page 2, line 8 - line 23 * * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 10 * * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 19 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 41 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5027371 (SEHIER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * abrégé *; column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 32 * * column 4, line 17 - line 24 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 * | [A] - QINGLI LIU ET AL, "PERFORMANCE OF DECISION-FEEDBACK EQUALIZERS WITH DUAL ANTENNA DIVERSITY", PERSONAL COMMUNICATION - FREEDOM THROUGH WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY, SECAUCUS, NJ., MAY 18 - 20, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930518), no. CONF. 43, pages 637 - 640, XP000393263 [A] 1,7,8 * abrégé *; page 638, column L, line 24 - line 48 * * figure 1 * |