EP0817144 - Method to control the use of a pager, pager functioning with this method and ic card for conditional access to a pager [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMPLUS Avenue du pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de la Plaine de Jouques 13420 Gemenos / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states GEMPLUS Avenue du pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de la Plaine de Jouques 13420 Gemenos / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lezama Argaez, Hector Alberto Cab. Ballot-Schmit, 7 rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Leduc, Michel Cab. Ballot-Schmit, 7 rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | 03 /
Karlisch, Thierry Cab. Ballot-Schmit, 7 rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 Rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401610.7 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | MX19960000261 | 05.07.1996 Original published format: MX 9600261 | FR19960013370 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9613370 | [1998/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817144 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817144 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G08B5/22 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G08B5/229 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Benutzung eines Rufempfängers, nach diesem Verfahren arbeitender Rufempfänger und Chipkarte für bedingten Zugang eines Rufempfängers | [1998/02] | English: | Method to control the use of a pager, pager functioning with this method and ic card for conditional access to a pager | [1998/02] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de l'utilisation d'un messageur, messageur fonctionnant selon ce procédé et carte à puce pour l'accès conditionné à un messageur | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 09.04.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2000 | ES | 27.09.2000 | FI | 27.09.2000 | GB | 27.09.2000 | IT | 27.09.2000 | NL | 27.09.2000 | DK | 27.12.2000 | PT | 27.12.2000 | SE | 27.12.2000 | DE | 28.12.2000 | GR | 29.12.2000 | IE | 19.04.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
ES | 27.09.2000 | ||
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
NL | 27.09.2000 | ||
DK | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DE | 28.12.2000 | ||
GR | 29.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
ES | 27.09.2000 | ||
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
NL | 27.09.2000 | ||
DK | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DE | 28.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
ES | 27.09.2000 | ||
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
NL | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DE | 28.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
ES | 27.09.2000 | ||
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DE | 28.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DE | 28.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.04.2001 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
IE | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
FI | 27.09.2000 | ||
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 27.09.2000 | |
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | GB | 27.09.2000 | |
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | PT | 27.12.2000 | |
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 27.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2222287 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - line 23 * * page 4, line 6 - line 22 *; | [A]EP0360228 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 13,17 * abstract * * column 23, line 15 - line 19 * * column 23, line 32 - line 50 *; | [X]WO9217006 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0538933 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 3,4,20,21 * abstract * * column 7, line 30 - line 51 *; | [A]GB2267168 (STAR PAGING [HK]) [A] 8,16 * page 19, line 19 - line 24 *; | [X]US5283832 (LOCKHART JR ROBERT K [US], et al) [X] 1,8,12,14-16 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - line 39 *; | [A]US5414418 (ANDROS JR RICHARD P [US]) [A] 19 * abstract ** column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 9 * |