EP0819504 - Apparatus for punching printed circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMA-TECH Parc d'Affaires des Portes, Chaussée du Vexin 27100 Val de Reuil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Automa-Tech Parc d'Affaires des Portes, Chaussée du Vexin 27100 Val de Reuil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sorel, Alain 6 Impasse des Bruyères, Garor 27180 Les Baux St Croix / FR | 02 /
Charbonnier, Serge 22 rue Grande 27120 Chambray / FR | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401675.0 | 11.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | FR19960008804 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608804 | [1998/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819504 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819504 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/01, B26D7/26, B26F1/02, H05K3/00 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
H05K3/005 (EP,US);
B23D35/008 (EP,US);
B26D7/015 (EP,US);
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
B26F1/02 (EP,US);
B26F2210/08 (EP,US);
Y10T483/17 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1731 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7747 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8742 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stanzvorrichtung zum Bohren von Leiterplatten | [1998/04] | English: | Apparatus for punching printed circuit boards | [1998/04] | French: | Machine de poinçonnage de plaque de circuit imprimé | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.10.2002 | [2004/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0236766 (IBM [US]) [A] 6* figure - *; | [Y]EP0287986 (USHIO KOGYO CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 14, line 14 - line 19; figures 8-11 *; | [Y]US4829375 (ALZMANN DONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 10, line 23 - column 12, line 27; figures 7-9 *; | [Y]EP0620108 (FETTE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 5 - line 9 *; | [Y] - "gridless printed circuit board drilling machine", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198904), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 242 - 243, XP000024657 [Y] 3 * the whole document * |