EP0823601 - Device for connecting at cryogenic temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna F-75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruocco-Angari, Bernard 82, rue des Gravilliers 75003 Paris / FR | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401892.1 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | FR19960009961 | 07.08.1996 Original published format: FR 9609961 | [1998/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823601 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F25D19/00, G01J5/06, C22C14/00 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
C22C14/00 (EP);
F25D19/006 (EP);
G01J5/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/43] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung bei Tiefsttemperaturen | [1998/07] | English: | Device for connecting at cryogenic temperature | [1998/07] | French: | Dispositif de liaison à température cryogénique | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/19] | 03.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.09.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.09.1998 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5179283 (COCKRUM CHARLES A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 66; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPS60251240 ; | [A]JPH0634216 ; | [A]US5198671 (HATCH BERT C [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 29 - column 6, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5260575 (IWASAKI NAOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 27 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2616448 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1,6 * page 11, line 1 - line 19; figure 1; table 1 *; | [A]GB772339 (TITANIUM METALS CORP) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 45 - page 6, line 16 *; | [A]GB1057578 (IMP METAL IND KYNOCH LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 35 - page 5, line 14 *; | [A]EP0514293 (CEZUS CO EUROP ZIRCONIUM [FR]); | [A]US4918312 (WELLMAN WILLIAM H [US], et al); | [A]US5355679 (PIERCE JAMES G [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860513), vol. 10, no. 128, Database accession no. (C - 345), & JP60251240 A 19851211 (KAGAKUGIJUTSUCHO KINZOKU ZAIRYO KENKYUSHO) [Y] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940516), vol. 18, no. 254, Database accession no. (M - 1605), & JP06034216 A 19940208 (FUJI ELECTRIC) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * |