EP0827909 - Tool for tensioning a strap,particularly a cable tie [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paulin, Daniel Hameau Loeuilly 76850 Etaimpuis / FR | 02 /
Robbes, Jean-Pierre 12 Rue Béchepay 76300 Sotteville les Rouen / FR | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1998/11] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402071.1 | 05.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | FR19960010907 | 06.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9610907 | [1998/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827909 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827909 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/02 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B65B13/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1998/48] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Werkzeug zum Spannen eines Bandes, insbesondere eines Kabelbandes | [1998/11] | English: | Tool for tensioning a strap,particularly a cable tie | [1998/11] | French: | Pince de traction pour laniére, en particulier pour collier de serrage | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR2585610 (LEGRAND) [DX] 1,3,8,28-31 * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 15; figure - *; | [A]US4947901 (J. RANCOUR) [A] 1 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 27; figure - *; | [A]US5372166 (CHANG-KENG LAI) [A] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 13; figure - *; | [A]US4561475 (M. HINDEN) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 68; figure - * |