EP0839605 - Spectacle frame holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIOT INTERNATIONAL 2, rue Roger Bonnet 27340 Pont de l'Arche / FR | [2002/21] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states BRIOT INTERNATIONAL 2, rue Roger Bonnet F-27340 Pont de l'Arche / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Videcoq, Jean-Jacques Bernard Joseph Hameau de la mare blanche 76570 Pavilly / FR | 02 /
Longuet, Raynald Gaston Marcel 96 chemin du Marais 27370 Le Gros Theil / FR | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402252.7 | 26.09.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | FR19960012076 | 03.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612076 | [1998/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839605 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839605 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/14 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B24B9/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brillengestellhalter | [1998/19] | English: | Spectacle frame holder | [1998/19] | French: | Porte-monture de lunettes | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 07.11.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Request for further processing for: | 06.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.12.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2707108 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 8, line 12 - line 17; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0337864 (BRIOT INT [FR]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9412897U (WERNICKE & CO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5-7 * page 11, line 15 - line 22; figures 1,4 * |