EP0842965 - Use of a filter silicone for the colour protection of dyed keratinic fibres against the influence of UV-rays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Hervé 31 rue Robert Schumann 93420 Villepinte / FR | 02 /
Lagrange, Alain 5 rue de Montry 77700 Coupvray / FR | 03 /
Dubief, Claude 9 rue Edmond Rostang 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 04 /
Braida-Valerio, Damarys 68 rue de Charenton 75012 Paris / FR | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Miszputen, Laurent L'OREAL Département Propriété Industrielle Centre Charles Zviak 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402346.7 | 06.10.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | FR19960012564 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612564 | [1998/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0842965 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0842965 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/38, C08G77/34 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
A61Q5/004 (EP,US);
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/21] | Title | German: | Verwendung von ein Silikonfiltersubstanz zum Schutz der Farbe bei keratinisch gefärbten Fasern | [1998/21] | English: | Use of a filter silicone for the colour protection of dyed keratinic fibres against the influence of UV-rays | [1998/21] | French: | Utilisation d'une silicone filtre pour la protection des fibres kératiniques colorées artificiellement contre les effets des radiations UV | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 04.04.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Request for further processing for: | 10.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.01.2001 | [2008/24] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 03.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0335777 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-6,20 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2642968 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-10,20 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2642967 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-5,13,14,20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0383655 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-6,20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0389337 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-6,20 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2657351 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9220690 (GIVAUDAN ROURE INT [CH]) [A] 1-5,13,20* page 12 *; | [X]EP0708108 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-12,20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0709080 (GIVAUDAN ROURE INT [CH]) [A] 1-5,13,20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0711779 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-10,20 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0742003 (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1-5,7-10,20 * the whole document * |