EP0837537 - Control device for a programmable remote control interrupter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société A D E E 300, rue des Arts et Métiers 21410 Pont de Pany / FR | [2006/31] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Société A D E E 300, rue des Arts et Métiers 21410 Pont de Pany / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girard, François 29, rue Eugène Bussière 21000 Dijon / FR | 02 /
Gauthier, Jean-Paul 7, rue des Arts et Métiers 21000 Dijon / FR | 03 /
Malet, Pascal 6, rue du 11 Novembre 21000 Dijon / FR | 04 /
Pontiggia, Michael 11, rue Arthur Morelet 21000 Dijon / FR | 05 /
Metral, Jean-Claude Les Platanes 12700 Saint-Bernard / FR | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Puiroux, Guy, et al Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Puiroux, Guy, et al Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/19] | Honoré, Anne-Claire Cabinet Claude Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | ||
Former [1998/17] | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46, rue Decamps 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402425.9 | 14.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | FR19960012566 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612566 | [1998/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837537 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837537 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
H02J13/00007 (EP,US);
H02J13/00034 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP,US);
Y02B90/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y04S20/242 (EP,US);
Y04S40/121 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für einen programmierbaren ferngesteuerten Schalter | [1998/17] | English: | Control device for a programmable remote control interrupter | [1998/17] | French: | Dispositif de commande par télérupteur programmable | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4202038 (PETERSSON STIG ANDERS [SE]) [A] 1* column A *; | [DA]US4465956 (FOWLER RICKY C [US]) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3920595 (ELSEN PETER DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |