EP0840061 - Flameholder for gas burner and burner comprising such flameholder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAZ DE FRANCE 23, rue Philibert Delorme 75017 Paris / FR | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerin, William 16Bis, rue Bréguet 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Bosso, Valérie 10, rue des Arènes 95120 Ermont / FR | 03 /
Verbeke, Bernard 5, rue des Acacias 95360 Montmagny / FR | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François, et al 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [1998/19] | Application number, filing date | 97402491.1 | 21.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | FR19960013402 | 04.11.1996 Original published format: FR 9613402 | [1998/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840061 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840061 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/26, F23D14/02, F23D14/58 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
F23D14/583 (EP,US);
F23D14/02 (EP,US);
F23D14/26 (EP,US);
F23D2203/1012 (EP,US);
F23D2203/105 (EP,US);
F23D2212/201 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00019 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/19] | Title | German: | Flammenhalter für Gasbrenner und Brenner mit einem solchen Flammenhalter | [1998/19] | English: | Flameholder for gas burner and burner comprising such flameholder | [1998/19] | French: | Dispositif d'accrochage de flammes pour brûleur à gaz et brûleur muni d'un tel dispositif | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3144073 (COREY RONALD D) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 35 - line 47 * * column 3, line 71 - column 4, line 21; figures 10-12; claim 7 *; | [A]GB2231949 (BURCO DEAN APPLIANCES LTD [GB]) [A] 2* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0635677 (GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0636837 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 22 - line 47; figure 2 * | by applicant | JPS58205012 | EP0635677 |