EP0847742 - Flexible pouch with opening sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cailleteau, Benoît 97, avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [1998/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402632.0 | 05.11.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | EP19960402711 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: EP 96402711 | [1998/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847742 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847742 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61G9/00, A61J19/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
A61G9/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/25] | Title | German: | Flexibler Beutel mit Öffnungshülse | [1998/25] | English: | Flexible pouch with opening sleeve | [1998/25] | French: | Poche souple à manchon d'ouverture | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 18.01.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2000 | ES | 26.01.2000 | FI | 26.01.2000 | GR | 26.01.2000 | IT | 26.01.2000 | NL | 26.01.2000 | SE | 26.01.2000 | DK | 26.04.2000 | PT | 26.04.2000 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
GR | 26.01.2000 | ||
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
DK | 26.04.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
DK | 26.04.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
IE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
FI | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 26.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0748620 (CAILLETEAU) [PX] 1 * column 3, line 27 - line 46 * * column 5, line 44 - line 49; figures 1,1A *; | [A]US5065459 (SURJA TJAHAJA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE513827 (ACKER) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 * |