EP0847752 - Without rub off topical composition containing a fluorosilicon compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnaud, Pascal 43, avenue du Général P.Billotte 94000 Creteil / FR | 02 /
Beaumard, Sophie 130, rue du Petit Leroy 94550 Chevilly Larue / FR | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Lhoste, Catherine L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Lhoste, Catherine L'OREAL, D.P.I., 90 rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402768.2 | 18.11.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | FR19960014484 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: FR 9614484 | [1998/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847752 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847752 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/897 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/70 (EP);
A61K8/8111 (EP);
A61Q1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abriebfeste topische Zusammensetzung enthaltend eine Fluorsilikon-Verbindung | [1998/25] | English: | Without rub off topical composition containing a fluorosilicon compound | [1998/25] | French: | Composition topique sans transfert comprenant un composé fluorosiliconé | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 23.05.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP01400303.2 / EP1129685 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06135818 ; | [A]EP0590192 (TOSHIBA SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0602905 (REVLON CONSUMER PROD CORP [US]) [AD] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9427568 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-32 * example 12 *; | [A]EP0657486 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0661042 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-32 * the whole document *; | JPH07277927 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [AP]WO9640044 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [AP] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO9716157 (REVLON CONSUMER PROD CORP [US]) [AP] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A] - STN, Serveur de Bases de Données,, XP002040202 [A] 1-32 * Karlsruhe, DE, Fichier Chemical Abstracts, vol 124, AN=97278 * résumé * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 018, no. 437, Database accession no. (C - 1238), & JP06135818 A 00000000 (SHIEIDO CO) [A] 1-32 * abstract * | Examination | JP07277927 | FR2689010 | EP0620270 | US5374372 | JPH08109121 | - Traduction du brevet JP8109121 A en français | - HANSEN M., "The three dimensional solubility parameters - Key to paint component affinities", JOURNAL OF PAINT TECHNOLOGY, (196702), vol. 39, no. 505, pages 104 - 117, XP002010040 | - FEDORS R.F., "A method for estimating both the solubility parameters and molar volumes of liquids", POLYMER ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, (197402), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1002/pen.760140211, pages 147 - 154, XP008069569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pen.760140211 | - WILLEMIN C., "Parametres de solubilite. Caracterisation et selection des silicones"", PARFUMS, COSMETIQUES ET AROMES, (199112), no. 102, pages 57 - 63, XP002071398 | - STN, Serveur de Bases de Données, XP002040202, Karlsruhe, DE, Fichier Chemical Abstracts, vol. 124, AN=97278 & JP 07 277 927 A (SHISEIDO CO), & JP07277927 A 00000000 |